US HB1140 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 28, United States Code, to prohibit the exclusion of individuals from service on a Federal jury on account of sexual orientation or gender identity.
Title
Juror Non-Discrimination Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2115 (Related) 2021-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3787 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB3787 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1140/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1140/BILLS-117hr1140ih.pdf |