US HB1168 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Retraining Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Secretary of Labor to pay to each covered veteran an assistance allowance for each month such veteran is enrolled in an employment and training program that teaches a skill in demand, as determined the Secretary. Limits such assistance to six months for each 10-year period. Includes as a covered veteran one who is: (1) unemployed for at least four consecutive months before applying for such assistance; (2) able to successfully complete the program; and (3) ineligible for other veterans' education or training assistance. Authorizes payment of a stipend to a covered veteran for moving expenses related to the receipt of such training. Authorizes appropriations.
Title
Veterans Retraining Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] | Rep. Walter Minnick [D-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. | |
2009-11-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 0 (Roll no. 832). (text: CR H12149) | |
2009-11-02 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12177-12178) | |
2009-11-02 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-11-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1168. | |
2009-11-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12149-12151) | |
2009-11-02 | Mr. Walz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-11-02 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 185. | |
2009-11-02 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-323. | |
2009-10-28 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2009-10-28 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-10-08 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2009-10-08 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-05-21 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employment and training programs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Employment and training programs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' pensions and compensation