US HB1170 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior, if the Secretary receives an offer from the city of Fernley, Nevada, to purchase identified federal land within the city, through the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) and the Bureau of Reclamation, to convey to the city all interest of the United States in such land in exchange for consideration in an amount equal to the fair market value of the land. Permits the city and the Bureau of Reclamation to retain easements or rights-of-way on the federal land to be conveyed, including easements or rights-of-way that are necessary to carry out the operation and maintenance of the Truckee Canal or the Newlands Project. Requires the city to pay or reimburse the Secretary, as appropriate, for reasonable transaction and administrative personnel costs associated with such conveyance. Declares that any conveyances under this Act shall not be considered a major federal action for purposes of an environmental impact statement required by the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA). Releases the United States from all liabilities or claims of any kind or nature arising from the presence, release, or threat of release of any hazardous substance, pollutant, contaminant, petroleum product (or derivative of a petroleum product), solid waste, mine materials, or mining related features existing on the federal land. Withdraws the federal land from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Land Management and the Bureau of Reclamation, to convey, by quitclaim deed, to the City of Fernley, Nevada, all right, title, and interest of the United States, to any Federal land within that city that is under the jurisdiction of either of those agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215. |
2013-12-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-297. |
2013-07-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-07-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-31 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1983 (Related) 2014-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.