US HB1185 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Protection Act of 2011 - Delays the effective date of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 until the date on which final judgment is entered in all cases challenging the constitutionality of the requirement to maintain minimum essential coverage that are pending before a federal court on the date of enactment of this Act. Prohibits the federal government from promulgating regulations under such Acts or otherwise preparing to implement such Acts until such date.
Title
Constitutional Protection Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Walsh [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2011-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, House Administration, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Appropriations, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB281 (Related) 2011-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Comprehensive health care
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals
Supreme Court
Comprehensive health care
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals
Supreme Court
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1185/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1185/BILLS-112hr1185ih.pdf |