US HB1195 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 140-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Labor to issue an occupational safety and health standard that requires covered employers within the health care and social service industries to develop and implement a comprehensive workplace violence prevention plan, and for other purposes.
Title
Workplace Violence Prevention for Health Care and Social Service Workers Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - On passage (Y: 254 N: 166 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) H.Amdt.41 (Y: 168 N: 256 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) H.Amdt.41 (Y: 168 N: 256 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-16 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 254 - 166 (Roll no. 118). |
2021-04-16 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.41 On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 168 - 256 (Roll no. 117). |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.41 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-16 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 303, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Keller amendment No. 5. |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.41 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Keller. (consideration: CR H1867-1872; text: CR H1867-1870) |
2021-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.40 On agreeing to the Courtney amendments (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.40 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-04-16 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 303, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Courtney amendment en bloc No. 1. |
2021-04-16 | House | H.Amdt.40 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Courtney. (consideration: CR H1865-1867; text: CR H1865-1866) |
2021-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1195. |
2021-04-16 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 and H.R. 1195. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 7 and provides one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1195 and provides one motion to recommit. |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 303. (consideration: CR H1849-1872; text: CR H1849-1852) |
2021-04-14 | House | Rule H. Res. 303 passed House. |
2021-04-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 303 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7 and H.R. 1195. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 7 and provides one motion to recommit. Rule also provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1195 and provides one motion to recommit. |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-14, Part I. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 20. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR303 (Related) 2021-04-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4182 (Related) 2022-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4182 (Related) 2022-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.