US HB1198 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Part-Time Federal Employees Equity Act of 2009 - Exempts a federal employee's part-time service performed before April 7, 1986, from proration requirements for purposes of annuity computation under the Civil Service Retirement System.
Title
Part-Time Federal Employees Equity Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia. | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. | |
2009-02-25 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E413-414) |
Same As/Similar To
SB469 (Related) 2010-04-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Temporary and part-time employment
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Temporary and part-time employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1198/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1198/BILLS-111hr1198ih.pdf |