US HB1225 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Puerto Rico Hospital HITECH Amendments Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to apply Medicare HITECH (Health Information Technology for Economic and Clinical Health Act) payments to subsection (d) hospitals in Puerto Rico to allow them to qualify for incentives for adoption and meaningful use of certified electronic health record Technology. (Generally, a subsection [d] hospital is an acute care hospital, particularly one that receives payments under Medicare's inpatient prospective payment system when providing covered inpatient services to eligible beneficiaries.)
Title
Puerto Rico Hospital HITECH Amendments Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2635 (Related) 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1602 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1961 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
SB1602 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1961 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Caribbean area
Computers and information technology
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Computers and information technology
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1225/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1225/BILLS-114hr1225ih.pdf |