US HB1240 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-289.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Sea Grant Office in the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to establish a Young Fishermen's Development Grant Program to provide training, education, outreach, and technical assistance initiatives for young fishermen. The office shall make competitive matching grants to support local and regional training, education, outreach, and technical assistance initiatives for young fishermen, including programs, workshops, and services related to (1) seamanship, navigation, electronics, and safety; (2) vessel and engine care, maintenance, and repair; and (3) sustainable fishing practices. Grant recipients must be a collaborative state, tribal, local, or regionally based network or partnership of public or private entities. Grants may not be used to purchase a fishing license, permit, quota, or other harvesting right.
Title
Young Fishermen's Development Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-289. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7871) |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7119-7120) |
2020-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1240. |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7119-7121) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-06-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 343. |
2020-06-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-429. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB496 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Business education
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Vocational and technical education
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Vocational and technical education