US HB1256 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the laws relating to the appointment of the Under Secretary of Health and Assistant Under Secretaries of Health of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Health Administration Leadership Transformation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2023-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1256/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1256/BILLS-118hr1256ih.pdf |