US HB1311 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the President, after the declaration of a major disaster, to direct the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to provide assistance necessary for meeting unmet needs as a result of such disaster.
Title
To amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to ensure that unmet needs after a major disaster are met.
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108. |
2019-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-146. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Emergency management
Family services
Housing and community development funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Emergency management
Family services
Housing and community development funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair