US HB1319 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to develop long-distance bike trails on Federal land.
Title
Biking on Long-Distance Trails Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1319/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1319/BILLS-118hr1319ih.pdf |