US HB1351 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Lands Service Corps Act of 2013 - Amends the Public Lands Corps Act of 1993 to rename: (1) the Public Lands Corps Act of 1993 as the Public Lands Service Corps Act of 1993, and (2) the Public Lands Corps as the Public Lands Service Corps (the Corps). Permits Corps participants to work in the National Marine Sanctuary System, coral reefs, and other coastal, estuarine, and marine habitats, and other lands and facilities administered by the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA). Requires the: (1) establishment of a department-level office within the Department of the Interior, Forest Service, and NOAA for the coordination of Corps activities; and (2) designation of a Corps coordinator for each agency within the Departments of the Interior, Agriculture, and Commerce that administers such activities. Establishes an Indian Youth Service Corps liaison. Expands those authorized to be in the Corps to permit the enrollment of consulting interns. Permits enrollment for a term of up to two years. Requires: (1) a recruitment program for the Corps, and (2) a training program at residential conservation centers or at other sites to provide training for Corps participants. Describes the types of natural and cultural resources conservation projects that may be carried out by the Corps. Authorizes: (1) the Corps to provide certain visitor and interpretation services, (2) establishing residential conservation centers, and (3) individual placements of consulting interns to perform management analysis activities for agencies under the Secretary's jurisdiction carrying out appropriate natural and cultural resources conservation projects. Authorizes cooperative agreements and competitive grants for Indian tribes and qualified youth or conservation corps to establish Indian Youth Service Corps programs. Requires the Secretary to issue management guidelines for programs of the Corps.
Title
Public Lands Service Corps Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB360 (Same As) 2013-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
Subjects
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National and community service
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Youth employment and child labor
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National and community service
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1351/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1351/BILLS-113hr1351ih.pdf |