US HB1380 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 174-15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2561 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback