US HB1395 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Weekends Without Hunger Act - Amends the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to direct the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), subject to the availability of appropriations, to implement a pilot program providing commodities, on a competitive basis, to nonprofits for the provision of nutritious food to at-risk school children on weekends and during extended school holidays during the school year. (At-risk school children are those who participate in the school lunch program and reside in an area served by a school in which at least 50% of the students receive free or reduced price meals under the school lunch or breakfast programs.) Includes elementary and secondary schools, school food authorities, food banks or pantries, homeless shelters, and other Secretary-approved emergency feeding agencies as eligible nonprofit recipients of such commodities. Requires commodity recipients to satisfy safe food storage, handling, and delivery standards established by the Secretary. Directs the Secretary to: (1) complete an interim evaluation of the pilot program by November 30, 2016, and (2) submit a final report to Congress by December 31, 2018, that contains an evaluation of such program and any recommendations the Secretary may have for legislative action. Authorizes appropriations for the pilot program.
Title
Weekends Without Hunger Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4765 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1395/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1395/BILLS-113hr1395ih.pdf |