US HB1407 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Title I: Animal Drug User Fee Amendments - Animal Drug User Fee Amendments of 2013 - (Sec. 103) Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to extend for FY2014-FY2018 the authority of the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to collect animal drug user fees, specifically new animal drug application or supplemental animal drug application fees, animal drug product fees, animal drug establishment fees, and animal drug sponsor fees. Revises the due date for annual user fees to the later of January 31 of each year or the first business day after enactment of an appropriations act providing for the collection and obligation of fees for the fiscal year. Establishes the amount of revenue such fees can generate. Specifies percentages of the total revenue that shall be derived from each type of user fee. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to adjust the total revenue amounts for FY2015 and subsequent fiscal years for inflation. Authorizes the Secretary to accept payment of user fees prior to their due date. Requires the total fees collected for FY2016-FY2018 to be increased by the cumulative amount, if any, by which the amount of user fees collected and appropriated for prior fiscal year falls below the cumulative amount of fees authorized. (Sec. 104) Extends requirements for the FDA to report to Congress on achieving goals related to animal drug development and review processes and implementation of authority to collect animal drug user fees. (Sec. 107) Terminates the authority to collect user fees October 1, 2018. Title II: Animal Generic Drug User Fee Amendments - Animal Generic Drug User Fee Amendments of 2013 - (Sec. 202) Extends for FY2014-FY2018 the authority of the FDA to collect generic animal drug user fees, specifically abbreviated application fees for generic new animal drugs, generic new animal drug product fees, and generic new animal drug sponsor fees. Subjects generic animal drug applications to a fee 50% of the amount of the normal fee if the application is for an animal drug which contains more than one active ingredient, or the labeling of the drug prescribes, recommends, or suggests use of the drug in combination with one or more other animal drugs, and the active ingredients or drugs intended for use in the combination have previously been separately approved. Revises the due date for annual generic animal drug user fees to the later of January 31 of each year or the first business day after enactment of an appropriations act providing for the collection and obligation of fees for the fiscal year. Establishes the total amount of revenue each type of generic user fee shall generate. Authorizes the Secretary to accept payment of user fees prior to their due date. (Sec. 203) Extends requirements for the FDA to report to Congress on achieving goals related to the generic animal drug development and review process and the implementation of the authority to collect generic animal drug fees. (Sec. 206) Terminates the authority to collect generic animal drug user fees October 1, 2018.
Title
Animal Drug User Fee Amendments of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135. |
2013-08-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-188. |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Related) 2013-06-13 - Became Public Law No: 113-14.
Subjects
Animal and plant health
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Health
User charges and fees
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Health
User charges and fees
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases