US HB1441 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits: (1) more than one gravesite from being provided at Arlington National Cemetery (Arlington) to a veteran or member of the Armed Forces who is eligible for burial there and family members also eligible for burial there, and (2) a gravesite from being reserved at Arlington before an individual's death. Provides an exception under (2) above, in the case of a request submitted to the Secretary of the Army before January 1, 1962. Requires a report from the Secretary to Congress on reservations made for interment at Arlington.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to codify the prohibition against the reservation of gravesites at Arlington National Cemetery, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-05-12 | House | Provisions of measure incorporated HR 1627. |
2011-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2011-04-08 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-04-08 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2011-04-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB698 (Same As) 2011-06-08 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB1627 (Related) 2012-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-154.
HB1627 (Related) 2012-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 112-154.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1441/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1441/BILLS-112hr1441ih.pdf |