US HB147 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 51-3)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Death Tax Repeal Act - Repeals the federal estate, gift, and generation-skipping transfer taxes.
Title
Death Tax Repeal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB177 (Same As) 2013-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB483 (Related) 2013-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1040 (Related) 2013-03-11 - Referred to House Rules
HB2373 (Related) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1402 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6129)
HB483 (Related) 2013-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1040 (Related) 2013-03-11 - Referred to House Rules
HB2373 (Related) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1402 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6129)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/147/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr147/BILLS-113hr147ih.pdf |