US HB1503 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Mineral Leasing Act to make certain adjustments in leasing on Federal lands for oil and gas drilling, and for other purposes.
Title
Restoring Community Input and Public Protections in Oil and Gas Leasing Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452. |
2022-12-14 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-628, Part I. |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15. |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |