US HB1513 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Federal Communications Commission to establish a task force to be known as the "6G Task Force", and for other purposes.
Title
FUTURE Networks Act Future Uses of Technology Upholding Reliable and Enhanced Networks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1513/BILLS-118hr1513ih.pdf |