US HB1516 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish Department of Homeland Security funding restrictions on institutions of higher education that have a relationship with Confucius Institutes, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Restrictions on Confucius Institutes and Chinese Entities of Concern Act
Sponsors
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] |
Rep. Mike Ezell [R-MS] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] | Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Dale Strong [R-AL] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] |
Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Elijah Crane [R-AZ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258. |
2023-12-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-319. |
2023-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 12. |
2023-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence Discharged |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Accountability. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.