US HB1558 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolving Environmental and Grid Reliability Conflicts Act of 2015 This bill amends the Federal Power Act to require the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) to ensure that any emergency order that may result in conflict with federal, state, or local environmental law or regulations: requires generation, delivery, interchange, or transmission of electricity only during hours necessary to meet the emergency and serve the public interest; be consistent with applicable environmental law; and minimizes any adverse environmental impacts to the maximum extent practical. Any necessary action or omission in such an emergency that does not comply with federal, state, or local environmental law or regulation shall not be considered a violation of it, or subject the party involved to any related requirement, civil or criminal liability, or a citizen suit. Such emergency orders must expire within 90 days. FERC may renew or reissue an order for subsequent periods of no more than 90 days each as necessary to meet the emergency and serve the public interest. During an emergency, a municipality engaged in the transmission or sale of electricity, and not otherwise subject to FERC jurisdiction, may make temporary connections with public utilities that are subject to FERC jurisdiction, and construct necessary or appropriate temporary electricity transmission facilities, without becoming subject to FERC jurisdiction by reason of that temporary connection or construction.
Title
Resolving Environmental and Grid Reliability Conflicts Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB848 (Related) 2015-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8 (Related) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB8 (Related) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Pollution liability
Public utilities and utility rates
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Pollution liability
Public utilities and utility rates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1558/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1558/BILLS-114hr1558ih.pdf |