US HB1560 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-157.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act to revise tribal membership requirements to provide tribal membership to any person of Tigua Ysleta del Sur Pueblo Indian blood enrolled by the tribe.
Title
To amend the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama and Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act to allow the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo Tribe to determine blood quantum requirement for membership in that tribe.
Sponsors
Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-157. |
2012-08-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-08-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5894) |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 480. |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka without amendment. Without written report. |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 112-635. |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2011-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/05/2011 H8132) |
2011-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8245) |
2011-12-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lujan objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2011-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1560. |
2011-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8131-8132) |
2011-12-05 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-09-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 144. |
2011-09-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-222. |
2011-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-07-20 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2011-06-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |