US HB160 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 242-40-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Medical Innovation Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the excise tax on medical device manufacturers and importers. This repeal applies to sales in calendar quarters beginning after the enactment of this Act. (Sec. 3) Prohibits the budgetary effects of this Act from being entered on either PAYGO scorecard under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.
Title
Protect Medical Innovation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - On Passage (Y: 280 N: 140 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 241 N: 186 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 241 N: 186 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2015-06-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 140 (Roll no. 375). (text: CR 6/17/2015 H4472) |
2015-06-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4525-4526) |
2015-06-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 160 and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Levin demanded the yeas and nays and pursuant to clause 8, rule XX, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced. |
2015-06-17 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H4478) |
2015-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 160. |
2015-06-17 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 160 and H.R. 1190. Each bill is closed under the rule, and shall be debatable for 1 hour. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2015-06-17 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 319. (consideration: CR H4472-4478) |
2015-06-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 319 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 160 and H.R. 1190. Each bill is closed under the rule, and shall be debatable for 1 hour. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2015-06-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 105. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-147. |
2015-06-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 14. |
2015-06-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB149 (Related) 2015-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR319 (Related) 2015-06-17 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 241 - 186 (Roll no. 372). (text: CR H4449)
HR319 (Related) 2015-06-17 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 241 - 186 (Roll no. 372). (text: CR H4449)