US HB1620 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Land Asset Inventory Reform Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to develop a multipurpose cadastre of federal real property (an inventory of real property of the federal government) to assist with federal land management, resource conservation, environmental protection, and use of real property. Authorizes the Secretary to enter into cost-sharing agreements with states to include any non-federal lands in a state in such cadastre. Limits the federal share of any such agreement to 50% of the total cost to a state for the development of the cadastre of the non-federal lands in the state. Requires the Secretary to submit a report on: (1) existing real property inventories or any components of any cadastre, (2) consolidation of inventories and components, (3) the use of existing inventories and components of any cadastre, (4) the cost savings that will be achieved, and (4) recommendations for legislation.
Title
Federal Land Asset Inventory Reform Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] | Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2011-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Related) 2011-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1620/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1620/BILLS-112hr1620ih.pdf |