US HB1624 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Finance Support Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require certain municipal obligations to be treated as high-quality liquid assets if they are investment grade, liquid, and readily marketable. Under current law, high-quality assets include level 1, level 2A, and level 2B liquid assets.
Title
Municipal Finance Support Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-10-03 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7704-7705) |
2017-10-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1624. |
2017-10-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7704-7706) |
2017-10-03 | House | Mr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219. |
2017-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-306. |
2017-07-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0. |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB828 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Securities
State and local finance
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Department of the Treasury
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Securities
State and local finance