US HB1657 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for a land exchange in the Chippewa National Forest, Minnesota, and for other purposes.
Title
Lake Winnibigoshish Land Exchange Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2023-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1657/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1657/BILLS-118hr1657ih.pdf |