US HB1665 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drunk Driving Repeat Offender Prevention Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to withhold specified graduated percentages of a state's apportionment of certain federal-aid highway funds for FY2016-FY2018 if the state has not enacted and is not enforcing a law requiring the installation of an ignition interlock device for a minimum of 180 days on each motor vehicle operated by an individual convicted of driving while intoxicated or driving under the influence (having a blood alcohol concentration of 0.08% or greater). Authorizes reduction of the 180-day period to 90 days if: (1) the driver's license is suspended for a minimum of 180 days as a result of the conviction, and (2) the period for installation of an ignition interlock device begins after the last day of the suspension.
Title
Drunk Driving Repeat Offender Prevention Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB979 (Related) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB5025 (Related) 2014-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5025 (Related) 2014-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1665/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1665/BILLS-113hr1665ih.pdf |