US HB1684 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Assistance Support for Communities and Homeowners Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to provide technical assistance to a common interest community that provides essential services of a governmental nature on actions such community may take to be eligible to receive reimbursement from a grantee that receives FEMA funds for certain activities performed following a disaster declaration. FEMA shall provide to specified congressional committees a legislative proposal on how to provide eligibility for disaster assistance with respect to common areas of condominiums and housing cooperatives.
Title
Disaster Assistance Support for Communities and Homeowners Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-06-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5144) |
2017-06-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1684. |
2017-06-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5144-5146) |
2017-06-26 | House | Mr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132. |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-193. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Cooperative and condominium housing
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Housing and community development funding
Cooperative and condominium housing
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Housing and community development funding