US HB1724 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kids First Research Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to terminate: (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account. Redesignates the Presidential Election Campaign Fund as the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund. Makes amounts in the Fund available only for allocation to national research institutes and national centers through the Common Fund for making grants for pediatric research under this Act. Requires deposit into the Treasury general fund of any amounts in the Pediatric Research Initiative Fund that remain unobligated on October 1, 2024. Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH), through the Division of Program Coordination, Planning, and Strategic Initiatives, to allocate funds appropriated under this Act to the national research institutes and national centers for making grants for pediatric research representing important areas of emerging scientific opportunities, rising public health challenges, or knowledge gaps that deserve special emphasis and would benefit from conducting or supporting additional research that involves collaboration between two or more national research institutes or national centers, or would otherwise benefit from strategic coordination and planning. Authorizes $13 million out of the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund for each of FY2014-FY2023 for pediatric research through the Common Fund. Requires such funds to supplement, not supplant, funds otherwise allocated by NIH for pediatric research. Prohibits the use of such amounts for any purpose other than making grants for pediatric research described in this Act. Requires the Director of NIH, before continuing any health economics research grant, project, or activity, to report to Congress on the justification for such research, including the reason for giving it priority over research on pediatric diseases and disorders. Prohibits the Director from initiating any health economics research grant, project, or activity until the Director has submitted the report outlining the justification and a federal law has been enacted authorizing NIH to use funding specifically for health economics research.
Title
Kids First Research Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2019 (Related) 2014-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 113-94.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1724/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1724/BILLS-113hr1724ih.pdf |