US HB1733 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Energy to review and update a report on the energy and environmental benefits of the re-refining of used lubricating oil. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Energy to update its report on the energy and environmental benefits of re-refining used lubricating oil and submit to Congress a strategic plan to increase the beneficial reuse of lubricating oil. The strategic plan shall address measures needed to: (1) increase the responsible collection of used oil; (2) disseminate public information concerning sustainable reuse options for used oil; and (3) promote sustainable reuse of used oil by federal agencies, recipients of federal grant funds, entities contracting with the federal government, and the general public.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Energy to review and update a report on the energy and environmental benefits of the re-refining of used lubricating oil.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7962) |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9808) |
2017-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1733. |
2017-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9808-9809) |
2017-12-12 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 339. |
2017-12-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-457. |
2017-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1089 (Related) 2018-11-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling