US HB1759 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends eligibility for reemployment services to all individuals claiming unemployment compensation. Currently, only unemployment claimants that are identified as likely to exhaust their regular unemployment compensation are eligible for such reemployment services.
Title
BRIDGE for Workers Act Building on Reemployment Improvements to Deliver Good Employment for Workers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 162 (Y: 393 N: 24 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 24 (Roll no. 162). (text: CR H3148) |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3168) |
2019-04-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1759. |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3148-3151) |
2019-04-09 | House | Mr. Davis, Danny K. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18. |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-38. |
2019-04-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2872 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.