US HB1839 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid Services Investment and Accountability Act of 2019 This bill alters several Medicaid programs and funding provisions. For example, the bill temporarily extends the applicability of Medicaid eligibility criteria that protect against spousal impoverishment for recipients of home- and community-based services. The bill also establishes a state Medicaid option to provide for medical assistance with respect to coordinated care provided through a health home (i.e., a designated provider or team of health-care professionals) for children with medically complex conditions. States must determine payment methodologies in accordance with specified requirements; payments also temporarily qualify for an enhanced federal matching rate. Further, drug manufacturers with Medicaid rebate agreements for covered outpatient drugs must disclose drug product information. Manufacturers are subject to civil penalties for knowingly misclassifying drugs. Manufacturers are also required to compensate for rebates that were initially underpaid as a result of misclassification (whether or not such misclassification was committed knowingly).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Services Investment and Accountability Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-16.
2019-04-18SenateSigned by President.
2019-04-10SenatePresented to President.
2019-04-10SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3224)
2019-04-03SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-04-02SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2203)
2019-03-26SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-03-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2773-2776)
2019-03-25HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2781)
2019-03-25HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Burgess objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2019-03-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1839.
2019-03-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2773-2780)
2019-03-25HouseMr. Ruiz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB937 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1226 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB205 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB317 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback