US HB1856 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional funding for, and otherwise addresses, assistance to homeless individuals and families. The funding provided by the bill is designated as emergency spending, which is exempt from discretionary spending limits. Specifically, the bill provides additional FY2020-FY2024 funding for the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to (1) award emergency relief grants to address unmet needs of homeless populations in jurisdictions with the highest need, and (2) provide additional incremental rental voucher assistance for individuals and families who are homeless. The bill also provides FY2020-FY2024 funding for HUD to award grants to provide outreach and coordinate services for individuals and families who are homeless or formerly homeless. Further, the bill provides additional FY2020-FY2024 funding for the Housing Trust Fund (dedicated to affordable housing for extremely low-income and very low-income families) and incremental project-based voucher and rental assistance. While this additional funding is available, HUD must ensure that priority for occupancy in assisted units is given to individuals and families who are homeless. Further, units receiving such assistance may not require families to contribute more than 30% of their adjusted income towards rent. Additionally, the bill provides funding for HUD to provide technical assistance to states, local governments, and nonprofit organizations to integrate and coordinate homeless assistance with federal health care programs. Finally, the bill permanently reauthorizes certain homeless assistance grants and makes permanent the U.S. Interagency Council on Homelessness.
Title
Ending Homelessness Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101. |
2019-07-05 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2019-07-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-137, Part I. |
2019-03-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2613 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Interagency Council on Homelessness
Low- and moderate-income housing
Medicaid
Mental health
State and local government operations
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Interagency Council on Homelessness
Low- and moderate-income housing
Medicaid
Mental health
State and local government operations