US HB1867 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alaska Native Veterans Land Allotment Equity Act This bill amends the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to revise provisions regarding land allotments for Alaska Native Vietnam veterans. Eligibility is expanded to include all Alaska Native veterans who served between August 5, 1964, and May 7, 1975. Allotments may be selected from vacant federal lands or lands that have been selected or conveyed to the state of Alaska or an Alaska Native corporation, if the state or corporation relinquishes or conveys the land to the United States for allotment. Land may not be selected from: (1) the right-of-way of the TransAlaska Pipeline; (2) the inner or outer corridor of that right-of-way; or (3) a unit of the National Park System, a National Preserve, or a National Monument. An heir of a deceased eligible veteran, regardless of the cause of death, may apply for and receive an allotment. Alaska Native Vietnam veterans who selected an allotment of land before enactment of this bill and who were not conveyed the allotment before the enactment of this bill may reselect land.
Title
Alaska Native Veterans Land Allotment Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB785 (Same As) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-451. Additional views filed.
SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1867/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1867/BILLS-115hr1867ih.pdf |