US HB1875 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Building Our Clean Energy Future Now Act of 2011 - Providing Gas Price Relief Through Public Transportation Act of 2011 - Authorizes additional FY2011-FY2012 appropriations for formula grants to both urbanized and nonurbanized areas for the operating and capital costs of public transportation (including intercity bus service) equipment and facilities, but only if grant recipients: (1) reduce or do not increase fares, (2) do not reduce service, (3) expand service, (4) acquire clean fuel or alternative fuel vehicle-related equipment or facilities, or (5) establish or expand commuter matching services. Requires a 100% federal share of a grant project involving acquisition of clean fuel or alternative fuel vehicle-related equipment or facilities to comply with the Clean Air Act. Amends the Safe, Accountable, Flexible, Efficient Transportation Equity Act: A Legacy for Users (SAFETEA-LU) to direct the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to issue guidance on nationwide implementation of the transit pass transportation fringe benefits program for federal employees. Directs the Secretary to establish a pilot program to carry out vanpool demonstration projects. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to prohibit major integrated oil companies from taking income deductions for: (1) intangible drilling and development costs in the case of oil and gas wells; or (2) income attributable to domestic production, refining, processing, transportation, or distribution activities. Denies them also the last-in, first-out (LIFO) inventory method. Allows a tax credit for new qualified heavy natural gas or hybrid motor vehicles. Extends the alternative fuel vehicle refueling property credit to the refueling of non-highway hydrogen fuel cell vehicles. Establishes in the Treasury to Clean Energy Fund to support activities under this Act. Amends the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 to require each electric utility to develop a plan to support the use of plug-in hybrid electric vehicles and electric vehicles, including heavy-duty hybrid electric vehicles. Directs the Secretary of Energy (Secretary for the remainder of this bill) to establish a program, including financial assistance, to deploy and integrate plug-in electric drive vehicles in multiple regions. Advanced Vehicle Technology Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary to conduct programs of basic and applied research, development, engineering, demonstration, and commercial application activities on: (1) materials, technologies, and processes with the potential to reduce or eliminate petroleum use and related emissions of the automotive and commercial vehicle sectors; (2) connectivity of vehicle and transportation systems; (3) advanced vehicle manufacturing technologies and practices; and (4) advanced technologies for medium- to heavy-duty commercial and transit vehicles. Requires the Secretary to: (1) make grants to demonstrate the integration of multiple advanced technologies on long-haul Class 8 truck and trailer platforms, (2) develop standard testing procedures and technologies to evaluate the performance of advanced heavy vehicle technologies, and (3) undertake a pilot program to improve total machine or system efficiency for heavy duty nonroad equipment.
Title
Building Our Clean Energy Future Now Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1795 (Related) 2011-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Business investment and capital
Commuting
Corporate finance and management
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental technology
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Materials
Motor carriers
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public transit
Public utilities and utility rates
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation costs
Transportation programs funding
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Business investment and capital
Commuting
Corporate finance and management
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental technology
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Materials
Motor carriers
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public transit
Public utilities and utility rates
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation costs
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1875/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1875/BILLS-112hr1875ih.pdf |