US HB1879 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard Employment Protection Act of 2010 - Provides employment and reemployment rights, beyond the Uniformed Services Employment and Reemployment Rights Act of 1994 (USERRA) five-year limit, for individuals ordered to full-time National Guard duty when the period of duty is expressly designated in writing by the Secretary of Defense (DOD).
Title
National Guard Employment Protection Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Baird [D-WA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Mary Fallin [R-OK] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. | |
2010-03-24 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 1 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR 3/22/2010 H2181) | |
2010-03-24 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2299-2300) | |
2010-03-22 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Filner objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-03-22 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1879. | |
2010-03-22 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2181) | |
2010-03-22 | Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 259. | |
2010-03-22 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-450. | |
2010-03-10 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-03-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-03-04 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2010-03-04 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-05-22 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-21 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employment discrimination and employee rights
National Guard and reserves
Employment discrimination and employee rights
National Guard and reserves