US HB1900 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Border Security, Cooperation, and Act Now Drug War Prevention Act - Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security and the Attorney General to provide to a state on a U.S. border up to 500 additional U.S. Border Patrol agents, Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) agents, and Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives (ATF) agents to patrol and defend the border, combat drug trafficking, and combat smuggling of firearms, explosives, alcohol, and tobacco if the state's governor declares an international border security emergency and requests such agents. Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security to: (1) increase the number of U.S. Border Patrol helicopters and power boats; (2) establish a fleet of motor vehicles appropriate for use by the Border Patrol; (3) equip such motor vehicles with portable computers with access to law enforcement databases; (4) augment existing radio communication systems in areas in which the Border Patrol operates; and (5) provide Border Patrol agents with global positioning system devices, night vision equipment, high-quality body armor, reliable and effective weapons, and uniforms. Establishes the ATF, DEA, and Border Patrol Task Force to monitor and report to Congress and the President on the trade and sale of drugs, alcohol, tobacco, firearms, and explosives along U.S. borders. Authorizes the Attorney General to make border security grants to sheriffs' offices and police departments in counties within 25 miles of the southern U.S. border.
Title
Border Security, Cooperation, and Act Now Drug War Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law. | |
2009-05-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-04-17 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to House Homeland Security | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5256 (Related) 2010-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Canada
Computers and information technology
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Motor vehicles
New Mexico
Smuggling and trafficking
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Texas
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Canada
Computers and information technology
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Motor vehicles
New Mexico
Smuggling and trafficking
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Texas
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1900/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1900/BILLS-111hr1900ih.pdf |