US HB1912 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make It in America Block Grant Program Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to establish a Make It in America Block Grant Program under which the Secretary is authorized to make grants to eligible entities to support the U.S. manufacturing industry. Allows such grants to be used, with respect to small and medium-sized manufacturers, for: (1) retooling or retrofitting, (2) business plan diversification, (3) improving energy efficiency, (4) employee training and retraining, and (5) the provision of capital and technical expertise. Outlines provisions concerning eligible entities, the allocation of grant funds, and requirements for grant recipients, including the submission of a proposed manufacturing enhancement strategy. Directs the Secretary to establish an advisory committee for advice in implementing and evaluating the program. Authorizes the Secretary to review and evaluate recipient performance under the program. Requires the Comptroller General to study the program, and report study results to Congress. Expresses the sense of Congress that program amounts should supplement and not replace other funding provided by federal departments and agencies to support the manufacturing industry.
Title
Make It in America Block Grant Program Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1457 (Related) 2011-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Industrial facilities
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Industrial facilities
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1912/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1912/BILLS-112hr1912ih.pdf |