US HB1920 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend part B of title XVIII of the Social Security Act to exclude customary prompt pay discounts from manufacturers to wholesalers from the average sales price for drugs and biologicals under Medicare, and for other purposes. This bill modifies the methodology used to calculate a manufacturer's average sales price for certain drugs covered under Medicare. Specifically, the bill excludes, from a manufacturer's average sales price calculation, customary prompt pay discounts extended to wholesalers.
Title
To amend part B of title XVIII of the Social Security Act to exclude customary prompt pay discounts from manufacturers to wholesalers from the average sales price for drugs and biologicals under Medicare, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1920/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1920/BILLS-115hr1920ih.pdf |