US HB1942 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the authority of the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to obtain business records, such as phone records, on an ongoing basis under the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act (FISA). FISA warrants shall only be for items specifically identified in the FBI's application to access the records. FISA currently allows the FBI to apply for a warrant to access records and other documents to obtain foreign intelligence information or to protect against international terrorism or clandestine intelligence activities. The application for such a warrant is ex parte before courts designated under FISA, meaning that the government is the only party present in the proceedings.
Title
Ending Mass Collection of Americans’ Phone Records Act
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB936 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5675 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
SB3242 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5675 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
SB3242 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Business records
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Right of privacy
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Business records
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Right of privacy
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1942/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1942/BILLS-116hr1942ih.pdf |