US HB1947 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Post 9/11 Troops to Teachers Enhancement Act - Amends the Troops-to-Teachers program of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (which provides veterans with teacher certification stipends in exchange for three years of service in a high-need local educational agency [LEA] or public charter school). Expands program eligibility to cover certain individuals: (1) who, on or after September 11, 2001, serve at least 90 continuous days on active duty in the Armed Forces before being honorably released from such service; or (2) who, on or after January 8, 2002, are separated or released from active duty after at least four (currently, six) years of continuous active duty immediately preceding such separation or release, and agree to serve in the Armed Forces Reserves for at least three years. Makes any LEA that is receiving school improvement funds eligible to host Troops-to-Teachers program participants. Directs the Secretary of Education to establish an Advisory Board, composed of federal, state, and veteran service organization representatives, to collect, study, and disseminate feedback from the program and report to Congress on how the program is operating and might be improved.
Title
Post 9/11 Troops to Teachers Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] | Rep. David Wu [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-05-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E922-923) |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1947/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1947/BILLS-112hr1947ih.pdf |