US HB1958 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Orthotics and Prosthetics Improvement Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, for application of quality standards for certain accredited suppliers of prosthetic devices, orthotics, and certain prosthetics, to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to designate and approve an independent accreditation organization with respect to such suppliers only if that organization is the American Board for Certification in Orthotics and Prosthetics, Inc. or the Board for Orthotist/ Prosthetist Certification (or a program with essentially equivalent accreditation and approval standards). Exempts from such standards any suppliers who: (1) are physicians, occupational therapists, or physical therapists licensed or otherwise regulated by the state in which they practice; and (2) receive Medicare payments. Modifies the Medicare payment rules for orthotics and prosthetics to account for practitioner qualifications and complexity of care. Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on: (1) HHS steps taken to ensure that the state licensure and accreditation requirements are enforced, and (2) the effects of requirements of this Act on the occurrence of Medicare fraud and abuse with respect to orthotics and prosthetics. Requires the Chief Actuary of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to submit to Congress a projection of the effect on cumulative federal spending under Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) for 2012-2016 that will result from implementation of this Act. Requires the Secretary, if the Chief Actuary projects that implementation of this Act will not result in a cumulative spending reduction of at least $250 million for 2012-2016, to issue an interim final regulation to strengthen the licensure, accreditation, and quality standards applicable to orthotics and prosthetics suppliers in order to produce such a cumulative reduction by the end of 2016. Exempts from such regulation any qualified physical therapist or qualified occupational therapist.
Title
Medicare Orthotics and Prosthetics Improvement Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA] | Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2125 (Related) 2012-02-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S910-912)
Subjects
Allied health services
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1958/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1958/BILLS-112hr1958ih.pdf |