US HB1972 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VA Billing Accountability Act (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to waive the requirement that a veteran make copayments for medication, hospital care, nursing home care, or medical services if the veteran received copayment notification more than 180 days after the medical service or receipt of medication and such delay was caused by VA error. In requiring a veteran to make a copayment for medical services, the VA shall notify the veteran within 180 days (18 months in the case of a non-VA facility) of the service. If the VA does not provide such notification, it may not collect the payment unless the veteran is provided with an opportunity to apply for a waiver or establish a payment plan. The VA shall review and improve its copayment billing internal controls and notification procedures.
Title
VA Billing Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4247) |
2018-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1972. |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4247-4248) |
2018-05-21 | House | Mr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 524. |
2018-05-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-681. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Debt collection
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care
Debt collection
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care