US HB200 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 and the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to provide that the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior are not required to reinitiate consultation on a land management plan or land use plan under certain circumstances, and for other purposes.
Title
FIR Act Forest Information Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] |
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. John Duarte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17. |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2023-03-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/200/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr200/BILLS-118hr200ih.pdf |