US HB2031 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anti-Swatting Act of 2015 Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for enhanced penalties for the transmission of misleading or inaccurate caller identification information with the intent to trigger a response by a law enforcement agency. Directs the court to order a defendant who has been convicted of such an offense to reimburse any law enforcement agencies or any government agencies or private not-for-profit organizations that provide fire, rescue, or emergency medical services for expenses incurred in responding to such conduct. Treats such an order of reimbursement as a civil judgment.
Title
Anti-Swatting Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2031/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2031/BILLS-114hr2031ih.pdf |