US HB2052 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Global Investment in American Jobs Act of 2013 - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) U.S. ability to attract foreign direct investment is directly linked to U.S. long-term economic prosperity, global competitiveness, and security; (2) it is a top national priority to enhance U.S. global competitiveness, prosperity, and security by removing unnecessary barriers to foreign direct investment and the U.S. jobs it creates and promoting policies to ensure the United States remains the premier global destination in which to invest, hire, innovate, and manufacture products; (3) maintaining the U.S. commitment to open investment policy encourages other countries to reciprocate and enables the United States to open new markets abroad for U.S. companies and their products; (4) U.S. policies regarding foreign direct investment should reflect national security interests and should not disadvantage domestic investors or companies; and (5) U.S. efforts to attract foreign direct investment should be consistent with efforts to maintain and improve the U.S. standard of living. Directs the Secretary of Commerce, in coordination with the Federal Interagency Investment Working Group and the heads of other relevant federal agencies, to conduct an interagency review of the U.S. global competitiveness in attracting foreign direct investment and report to Congress recommendations for increasing that U.S. global competitiveness without weakening labor, consumer, financial, or environmental protections.
Title
Global Investment in American Jobs Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Trey Radel [R-FL] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-09 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 379 N: 32 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557. |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. With written report No. 113-252. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2013-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 32, 1 Present (Roll no. 448). (text: CR H5411) |
2013-09-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5416-5417) |
2013-09-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2052. |
2013-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5411-5414) |
2013-09-09 | House | Mr. Terry moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1023 (Related) 2013-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Employee hiring
Foreign trade and international finance
Government studies and investigations
Manufacturing
Research and development
U.S. and foreign investments
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Employee hiring
Foreign trade and international finance
Government studies and investigations
Manufacturing
Research and development
U.S. and foreign investments