US HB2158 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-17)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Pending: Senate Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Pending: Senate Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14901 Adelfa Drive in La Mirada, California, as the "Wayne Grisham Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 14901 Adelfa Drive in La Mirada, California, as the "Wayne Grisham Post Office".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 353 N: 1 NV: 79 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2011-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 353 - 1 (Roll no. 914). (text: CR H8327) |
2011-12-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8340-8341) |
2011-12-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2158. |
2011-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8327-8328) |
2011-12-12 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-03 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged. |
2011-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy . |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2011-06-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1071) |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Postal service