US HB2158 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expedited Departure of Certain Snake Species Act - Eases restrictions on transporting invasive animals under the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 for the transport of the Burmese python, Indian python, Northern African python, Southern African python, and Yellow anaconda. Allows an intermediate stop during the transport of those snakes if: (1) the stop is made in a designated airport in the course of transport that begins at a designated airport and ends at a place outside of the United States no later than 48 hours after the transport begins, (2) the transport does not include a stop in Hawaii, or (3) the snake is in a qualified secure container during transport between aircraft used to transport the snake outside of the United States.
Title
Expedited Departure of Certain Snake Species Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 443. |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-596. |
2014-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-16 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |