US HB2251 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-60.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the U.S. courthouse and federal building located at 118 South Mill Street, Fergus Falls, Minnesota, as the "Edward J. Devitt United States Courthouse and Federal Building."
Title
To designate the United States courthouse and Federal building located at 118 South Mill Street, in Fergus Falls, Minnesota, as the "Edward J. Devitt United States Courthouse and Federal Building.".
Sponsors
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 416 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-60. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8917-8918) |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2013-09-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2013-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 4 (Roll no. 496). (text: CR 9/27/2013 H5890-5891) |
2013-09-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5985) |
2013-09-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2251. |
2013-09-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5890-5892) |
2013-09-27 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-09-27 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 59. |
2013-09-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-234. |
2013-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB711 (Related) 2013-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Minnesota
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Minnesota