US HB2341 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SERVE Act Seeking an End to Restrictions on Votive Employees Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to specify that a retirement income account provided by a church or a convention or association of churches may cover: (1) a duly ordained, commissioned, or licensed minister of a church in the exercise of his ministry, regardless of the source of his compensation; (2) an employee of a tax-exempt organization, whether a civil law corporation or otherwise, that is controlled by or associated with a church or a convention or association of churches; and (3) certain employees who have been separated from service with a church, a convention or association of churches, or an organization described above.
Title
SERVE Act Seeking an End to Restrictions on Votive Employees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB674 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6757 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2341/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2341/BILLS-115hr2341ih.pdf |